TX HB2339 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of information from the lists of noncitizens and nonresidents excused or disqualified from jury service.
Title
Relating to the use of information from the lists of noncitizens and nonresidents excused or disqualified from jury service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-13 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 155 |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Elections |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB155 (Same As) 2021-05-30 - Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported