TX SB155 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-30 - Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the use of information from the lists of noncitizens and nonresidents excused or disqualified from jury service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use of information from the lists of noncitizens and nonresidents excused or disqualified from jury service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1224 (Y: 83 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - Record vote RV#1215 (Y: 79 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1214 (Y: 64 N: 78 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-05-17 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1213 (Y: 64 N: 79 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-05-17 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1212 (Y: 65 N: 76 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-05-17 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1211 (Y: 63 N: 77 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-30SenateRecord vote
2021-05-30SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2021-05-30SenateSenate adopts resolution to go outside bounds SR 540
2021-05-30SenateRecord vote
2021-05-30SenateRules suspended
2021-05-29HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2021-05-29SenateConference committee report filed
2021-05-28SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-28SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2021-05-28HouseHouse appoints conferees
2021-05-28HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2021-05-27HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-27HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2021-05-27HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2021-05-27SenateSenate appoints conferees
2021-05-27SenateSenate requests conference committee
2021-05-27SenateSenate refuses to concur
2021-05-27SenateVote reconsidered
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-27SenateRead
2021-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-18SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18HouseRecord vote RV#1224
2021-05-18HousePassed
2021-05-18HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1215
2021-05-17HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1214
2021-05-17HouseAmendment fails of adoption 5-J. González
2021-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1213
2021-05-17HouseAmendment fails of adoption 4-J. González
2021-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1212
2021-05-17HouseAmendment fails of adoption 3-J. González
2021-05-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1211
2021-05-17HouseAmendment fails of adoption 2-Bucy
2021-05-17HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-05-13HousePostponed 5/17/21 10:00 AM
2021-05-13HousePoint of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
2021-05-13HouseAmended 1-Neave
2021-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-13HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HB 2339
2021-05-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-12HouseReferred to Elections
2021-04-12HouseRead first time
2021-04-07HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-06SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-06SenateRecord vote
2021-04-06SenatePassed
2021-04-06SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-06SenateRecord vote
2021-04-06SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-03-31SenateRecord vote
2021-03-31SenatePassed to engrossment
2021-03-31SenateRecord vote
2021-03-31SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-03-31SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Eckhardt
2021-03-31SenateRecord vote
2021-03-31SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-03-31SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Eckhardt
2021-03-31SenateRead 2nd time
2021-03-31SenateRecord vote
2021-03-31SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-03-30SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-23SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-08SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-11-10SenateFiled
2020-11-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2339 (Same As) 2021-05-13 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB155
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00155I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00155S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00155E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00155H.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00155S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00155S2F2.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00155H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00155H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00155H23.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00155H24.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00155H25.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00155I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00155I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00155E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00155H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00155H.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ03-31-F.PDF#page=14
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ03-31-F.PDF#page=15
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ03-31-F.PDF#page=16
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-06-F.PDF#page=11
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB155&RcdVtNo=1211&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB155&RcdVtNo=1212&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB155&RcdVtNo=1213&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB155&RcdVtNo=1214&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB155&RcdVtNo=1215&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB155&RcdVtNo=1224&Ch=H&Dt=05/18/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=18
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-30-F.PDF#page=2
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-30-F.PDF#page=3

Bill Comments

feedback