TX HB229 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-31 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-31 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the Texas Water Development Board to use the state participation account of the water development fund to provide financial assistance for the development of certain facilities.
Title
Relating to the authority of the Texas Water Development Board to use the state participation account of the water development fund to provide financial assistance for the development of certain facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-31 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-07-31 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-07-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-07-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-07-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-07-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-07-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-07-20 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-07-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-07-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
PERMITS
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
TEXAS STATE WATER INVESTMENT FUND ACT
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General
Water--Rights
PERMITS
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
TEXAS STATE WATER INVESTMENT FUND ACT
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General
Water--Rights