TX HB2238 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-20 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-20 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the regulation of manufactured housing.
Title
Relating to the regulation of manufactured housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-20 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-05-20 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-11 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-11 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-11 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-11 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-08 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-08 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-08 | Record vote | |
2009-05-08 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2009-05-05 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-05 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-05 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-05 | Record vote | |
2009-05-05 | Passed | |
2009-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-05 | Record vote | |
2009-05-05 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-05 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-05 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-05 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-24 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2009-04-15 | Read first time | |
2009-04-14 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-09 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-09 | Record vote | |
2009-04-09 | Passed | |
2009-04-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-09 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-03-31 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-03-31 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-30 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-25 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-25 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-03-25 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-18 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-18 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-18 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-03-03 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1856 (Same As) 2009-03-24 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
Housing
Housing--Manufactured Housing
MANUFACTURED HOUSING BOARD
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Housing
Housing--Manufactured Housing
MANUFACTURED HOUSING BOARD
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens