TX HB2107 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing the possession, use, cultivation, distribution, transportation, and delivery of medical cannabis for medical use by patients with certain debilitating medical conditions and the licensing of dispensing organizations and cannabis testing facilities; authorizing fees.
Title
Relating to authorizing the possession, use, cultivation, distribution, transportation, and delivery of medical cannabis for medical use by patients with certain debilitating medical conditions and the licensing of dispensing organizations and cannabis testing facilities; authorizing fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2017-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Electronic Information Systems
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MARIHUANA
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Crimes--Drugs
Electronic Information Systems
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MARIHUANA
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF