TX HB2107 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Facilities Commission; authorizing fees.
Title
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Facilities Commission; authorizing fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2013-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
FACILITIES COMMISSION, TEXAS
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
HISTORICAL COMMISSION, TEXAS
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
PARTNERSHIP ADVISORY COMMISSION
PRESERVATION BOARD, STATE
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
STATE AGENCIES' RULES
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE CAPITOL BUILDING & GROUNDS
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
FACILITIES COMMISSION, TEXAS
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
HISTORICAL COMMISSION, TEXAS
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
PARTNERSHIP ADVISORY COMMISSION
PRESERVATION BOARD, STATE
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
STATE AGENCIES' RULES
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE CAPITOL BUILDING & GROUNDS
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB2107 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB02107I.htm |