TX HB2058 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to age-appropriate normalcy activities for children in the managing conservatorship of the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to age-appropriate normalcy activities for children in the managing conservatorship of the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#297 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-21SenateRecord vote
2021-05-21SenatePassed
2021-05-21SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-21SenateRecord vote
2021-05-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-21SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-18SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-18SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-12SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-04SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-05-04SenateRead first time
2021-04-19SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#297
2021-04-16HousePassed
2021-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-16HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-16HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-16HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-07HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-01HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-01HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB52 (Same As) 2021-03-03 - Referred to Health & Human Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2058
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02058I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02058S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02058F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02058I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02058H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02058E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02058E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2058&RcdVtNo=297&Ch=H&Dt=04/16/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=16

Bill Comments

feedback