TX HB2 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to making supplemental appropriations and reductions in appropriations and giving direction and adjustment authority regarding appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to making supplemental appropriations and reductions in appropriations and giving direction and adjustment authority regarding appropriations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1546 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#415 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#414 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Calendars Committee rule adopted RV#225 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective immediately
2021-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-02 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-29 Sent to the Comptroller
2021-05-29SenateSigned in Senate-Art III Sec 49a Tx. Const.
2021-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-27SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-27HouseSubject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
2021-05-27HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-27HouseRecord vote RV#1546
2021-05-27HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-26HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-26HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-26HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-26SenateRecord vote
2021-05-26SenatePassed
2021-05-26SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-26SenateRecord vote
2021-05-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenateAmended
2021-05-26SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Nelson
2021-05-26SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-26SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-22SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-20SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-05-20SenateNo action taken in committee
2021-05-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-29SenateReferred to Finance
2021-04-29SenateRead first time
2021-04-26SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-23HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-22HouseSubject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
2021-04-22HouseRecord vote RV#415
2021-04-22HousePassed
2021-04-22HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-22HouseRecord vote RV#414
2021-04-22HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2021-04-22HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-22HouseAmended 4-Parker
2021-04-22HouseAmended 3-Morrison, Price, Howard, Minjarez, Ramos, J. González, Reynolds, Larson, Muñoz, Huberty, More
2021-04-22HouseAmendment withdrawn 2-Landgraf
2021-04-22HouseAmended 1-Bonnen
2021-04-22HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-15HouseRecord vote RV#225
2021-04-15HouseCalendars Committee rule adopted
2021-04-22HousePlaced on Emergency Calendar
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-01HouseMeeting cancelled
2021-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Appropriations
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2021-02-26HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00002I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00002H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00002E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00002S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00002F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00002H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00002H23.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00002H24.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00002H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00002S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00002I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00002H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00002H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00002E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00002E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00002S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00002S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00002F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2&RcdVtNo=225&Ch=H&Dt=04/15/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2&RcdVtNo=414&Ch=H&Dt=04/22/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2&RcdVtNo=415&Ch=H&Dt=04/22/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2&RcdVtNo=1546&Ch=H&Dt=05/27/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=6

Bill Comments

feedback