TX HB199 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of a public law school in El Paso County.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a public law school in El Paso County.
Sponsors
Rep. Lina Ortega [D] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Art Fierro [D] |
Rep. Claudia Ordaz Perez [D] | Rep. Eddie Morales [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#247 (Y: 86 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-15 | House | Record vote RV#247 |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB603 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Higher Education
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
EL PASO COUNTY
EL PASO SCHOOL OF LAW
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
EL PASO COUNTY
EL PASO SCHOOL OF LAW
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS