TX HB1965 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the calculation of the ad valorem rollback tax rate of a taxing unit and voter approval of a proposed tax rate that exceeds the rollback tax rate.
Title
Relating to the calculation of the ad valorem rollback tax rate of a taxing unit and voter approval of a proposed tax rate that exceeds the rollback tax rate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-07 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-07 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2015-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate