TX HB195 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-14 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-14 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of migrant labor housing facilities; changing the amount of a civil penalty.
Title
Relating to the regulation of migrant labor housing facilities; changing the amount of a civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Failed to pass RV#1180 (Y: 61 N: 68 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1180 |
2021-05-14 | House | Failed to pass |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-13 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-31 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-31 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--General
Labor
Labor--Agricultural Workers
Labor--Health & Safety
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--General
Labor
Labor--Agricultural Workers
Labor--Health & Safety