TX HB1946 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the incontestability of certain contracts or leases submitted to the attorney general by certain water districts.
Title
Relating to the incontestability of certain contracts or leases submitted to the attorney general by certain water districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#892 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#892 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-06 | House | Passed |
2017-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-05 | House | Amended |
2017-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-15 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
BONDS
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
BONDS
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility