TX HB1860 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a deduction under the franchise tax for certain contracts with the federal government.
Title
Relating to a deduction under the franchise tax for certain contracts with the federal government.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-25 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-25 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2013-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed |