TX HB1840 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the establishment of an interagency farm-to-school coordination task force.
Title
Relating to the establishment of an interagency farm-to-school coordination task force.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-04 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | |
2009-03-04 | Read first time | |
2009-02-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1027 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Subjects
Agriculture
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
FOOD
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
FOOD