TX HB1739 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-15)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to recovery under uninsured and underinsured motorist insurance coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to recovery under uninsured and underinsured motorist insurance coverage.

Sponsors

Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Yvonne Davis [D]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]
Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]
Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Michelle Beckley [D]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]
Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D]Rep. John Bucy [D]Rep. Gina Calanni [D]Rep. Terry Canales [D]
Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Sheryl Cole [D]Rep. Garnet Coleman [D]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]
Rep. Philip Cortez [D]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]Rep. Alex Dominguez [D]
Rep. Harold Dutton [D]Rep. Jessica Farrar [D]Rep. Art Fierro [D]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]
Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Jessica Gonzalez [D]Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Roland Gutierrez [D]
Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]Rep. Donna Howard [D]
Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Celia Israel [D]Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D]Rep. Julie Johnson [D]
Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Tracy King [D]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]
Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. Ray Lopez [D]Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D]
Rep. Terry Meza [D]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Joseph Moody [D]Rep. Christina Morales [D]
Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D]Rep. Lina Ortega [D]
Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]Rep. Mary Perez [D]Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]
Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]Rep. Toni Rose [D]
Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D]Rep. Carl Sherman [D]Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. James Talarico [D]
Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]Rep. Chris Turner [D]Rep. John Turner [D]
Rep. Hubert Vo [D]Rep. Armando Walle [D]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]

Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1189 (Y: 105 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-09HouseRecord vote RV#1189
2019-05-09HousePassed
2019-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-08HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-08HouseAmended 1-Geren
2019-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-07HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-02HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback