TX HB1737 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to statutes of limitation and repose for certain claims involving the construction or repair of an improvement to real property or equipment attached to real property.
Title
Relating to statutes of limitation and repose for certain claims involving the construction or repair of an improvement to real property or equipment attached to real property.
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Holland [R] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Rep. John Cyrier [R] | Rep. Keith Bell [R] |
Rep. Kyle Kacal [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ARCHITECTS & ARCHITECTURE
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
ENGINEERS & ENGINEERING
INTERIOR DESIGNERS
LANDSCAPE ARCHITECTS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
STATUTES OF LIMITATIONS
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
ENGINEERS & ENGINEERING
INTERIOR DESIGNERS
LANDSCAPE ARCHITECTS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
STATUTES OF LIMITATIONS