TX HB1669 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Left pending in committee
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to certificates of public convenience and necessity for water or sewer services.
Title
Relating to certificates of public convenience and necessity for water or sewer services.
Sponsors
Rep. William Callegari [R] | Sen. Glenn Hegar [R] | Rep. Charlie Howard [R] | Rep. Jim Pitts [R] |
Rep. Allan Ritter [R] | Rep. Wayne Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-18 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-05-18 | Read first time | |
2009-05-15 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-14 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-14 | Record vote | |
2009-05-14 | Passed as amended | |
2009-05-14 | Amended | |
2009-05-14 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-13 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-13 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-13 | Amended | |
2009-05-13 | Amended | |
2009-05-13 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-13 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-05-13 | Postponed | |
2009-05-13 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on Major State Calendar | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-06 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-23 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-23 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-10 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-10 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-03 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-03 | Read first time | |
2009-02-23 | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Utilities
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer
City Government--Utilities
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer