TX HB1661 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-04 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-04 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to child custody evaluations and adoption evaluations conducted and testimony provided in certain suits affecting the parent-child relationship; providing penalties; authorizing fees.
Title
Relating to child custody evaluations and adoption evaluations conducted and testimony provided in certain suits affecting the parent-child relationship; providing penalties; authorizing fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2013-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ADOPTION
CHILD CUSTODY
CONSERVATORSHIP
EXAMINERS OF PROFESSIONAL COUNSELORS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Parent & Child
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
MARRIAGE & FAMILY THERAPISTS, TEXAS ST. BD. OF EXAMINERS OF
PSYCHOLOGISTS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF EXAMINERS OF
CHILD CUSTODY
CONSERVATORSHIP
EXAMINERS OF PROFESSIONAL COUNSELORS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Parent & Child
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
MARRIAGE & FAMILY THERAPISTS, TEXAS ST. BD. OF EXAMINERS OF
PSYCHOLOGISTS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF EXAMINERS OF