TX HB166 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to restrictions on the age of persons employed by or allowed on the premises of a sexually oriented business; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to restrictions on the age of persons employed by or allowed on the premises of a sexually oriented business; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB315 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverage Regulation
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
SEXUALLY ORIENTED BUSINESSES
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
SEXUALLY ORIENTED BUSINESSES
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB166 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00166I.htm |