TX HB1607 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-04 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-04 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the amount of temporary income benefits to which an injured employee is entitled under the workers’ compensation system.
Title
Relating to the amount of temporary income benefits to which an injured employee is entitled under the workers’ compensation system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2015-05-04 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2015-04-29 | House | Postponed |
2015-04-29 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-04-23 | House | Postponed |
2015-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-03-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2015-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-18 | House | Filed |