TX HB1548 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the civil liability of certain businesses in connection with allowing concealed handguns on the business premises.
Title
Relating to the civil liability of certain businesses in connection with allowing concealed handguns on the business premises.
Sponsors
Rep. Cecil Bell [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Gary Gates [R] | Rep. Steve Toth [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1105 (Y: 94 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1105 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-31 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-31 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-03-08 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
CONCEALED HANDGUNS
Weapons
Business & Commerce--General
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
CONCEALED HANDGUNS
Weapons