TX HB1496 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring school districts to report management fees under certain cooperative purchasing contracts.
Title
Relating to requiring school districts to report management fees under certain cooperative purchasing contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#417 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-23 | House | Record vote RV#417 |
2021-04-23 | House | Passed |
2021-04-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-12 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-07 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-07 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1597 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Education