TX HB1492 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the National Museum of the Pacific War museum fund.
Title
Relating to the creation of the National Museum of the Pacific War museum fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Miller [R] | Rep. Celia Israel [D] | Rep. Andrew Murr [R] | Rep. Phil Stephenson [R] |
Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#469 (Y: 143 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Read 2nd time RV#396 (Y: 135 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#469 (Y: 143 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Read 2nd time RV#396 (Y: 135 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-22 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-25 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-25 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2017-03-07 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Historic Preservation & Museums
HISTORICAL COMMISSION, TEXAS
Military & Veterans
NATIONAL MUSEUM OF THE PACIFIC WAR
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
HISTORICAL COMMISSION, TEXAS
Military & Veterans
NATIONAL MUSEUM OF THE PACIFIC WAR
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control