TX HB1485 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of elevator mechanics, elevator apprentices, and contractors; requiring an occupational registration.
Title
Relating to the regulation of elevator mechanics, elevator apprentices, and contractors; requiring an occupational registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - House - Failed to pass to engrossment RV#522 (Y: 70 N: 74 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-04-29 - House - Vote reconsidered RV#521 (Y: 73 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - RV#512 (Y: 71 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - Failed to pass to engrossment RV#513 (Y: 62 N: 78 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-04-29 - House - Vote reconsidered RV#521 (Y: 73 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - RV#512 (Y: 71 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - Failed to pass to engrossment RV#513 (Y: 62 N: 78 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-29 | House | Record vote RV#522 |
2021-04-29 | House | Failed to pass to engrossment |
2021-04-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-29 | House | Record vote RV#521 |
2021-04-29 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2021-04-28 | House | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration |
2021-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-28 | House | Record vote RV#513 |
2021-04-28 | House | Failed to pass to engrossment |
2021-04-28 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 1(b) |
2021-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-28 | House | Record vote RV#512 |
2021-04-28 | House | Amended 1-C. Turner |
2021-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2021-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1863 (Same As) 2021-03-26 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
ELEVATORS
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Safety
ELEVATORS
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Safety