TX HB1468 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-30 - Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a local remote learning program operated by a public school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a local remote learning program operated by a public school.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#497 (Y: 135 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-30SenateRemarks ordered printed
2021-05-30SenateRecord vote
2021-05-30SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2021-05-29HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2021-05-29SenateConference committee report filed
2021-05-29HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-29HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2021-05-28SenateSenate appoints conferees
2021-05-28SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2021-05-28SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-28SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2021-05-28SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2021-05-28HouseHouse appoints conferees
2021-05-28HouseHouse requests conference committee
2021-05-28HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-26SenateRecord vote
2021-05-26SenatePassed
2021-05-26SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-26SenateRecord vote
2021-05-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenateAmended
2021-05-26SenateAmendment(s) offered FA11 Kolkhorst
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenateAmended
2021-05-26SenateAmendment(s) offered FA10 Paxton
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenateAmended
2021-05-26SenateAmendment(s) offered FA9 Hughes
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenateAmended
2021-05-26SenateAmendment(s) offered FA8 Eckhardt
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenateAmended
2021-05-26SenateAmendment(s) offered FA7 Lucio
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenateAmended
2021-05-26SenateAmendment(s) offered FA6 Bettencourt
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenateAmended
2021-05-26SenateAmendment(s) offered FA5 Bettencourt
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenateAmended
2021-05-26SenateAmendment(s) offered FA4 Taylor
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenateAmended
2021-05-26SenateAmendment(s) offered FA3 Taylor
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenateAmended
2021-05-26SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1468 Taylor
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenateAmended
2021-05-26SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Taylor
2021-05-26SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-26SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-26SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-24SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2021-05-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-24SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-21SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-21SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Education
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-04-28SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-28HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-28HouseRecord vote RV#497
2021-04-28HousePassed
2021-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-27HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-27HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-27HouseAmended 2-Burrows
2021-04-27HouseAmended 1-K. King
2021-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-27HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-07HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-07HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-07HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-30HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-30HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-03-05HouseRead first time
2021-01-29HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1468
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01468I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01468H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01468E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01468S.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01468H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01468H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01468S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01468S2F2.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01468S2F3.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01468S2F4.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01468S2F5.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01468S2F6.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01468S2F7.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01468S2F8.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01468S2F9.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01468S2F10.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01468S2F11.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01468I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01468H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01468H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01468E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01468E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01468S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01468S.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1468&RcdVtNo=497&Ch=H&Dt=04/28/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=14
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-30-F.PDF#page=36

Bill Comments 750

feedback