TX HB1424 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the operation of an unmanned aircraft over certain facilities or sports venues; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the operation of an unmanned aircraft over certain facilities or sports venues; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2014 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#527 (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Amended RV#502 (Y: 120 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 26) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-28SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-28HouseRecord vote
2017-05-28HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-27HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-27SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-27HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-27HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-27SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-27SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2017-05-27SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-27SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-27SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-27HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-27HouseHouse requests conference committee
2017-05-27HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2017-05-27HouseRules suspended
2017-05-26HouseReturned to the Senate for further action
2017-05-24HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-24HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenatePassed
2017-05-23SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateAmended
2017-05-23SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateAmended
2017-05-23SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-23SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-23SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-04SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-05-04SenateRead first time
2017-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-28HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-28HouseRecord vote
2017-04-28HousePassed
2017-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27HouseRecord vote
2017-04-27HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-27HouseAmended
2017-04-27HouseAmended
2017-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-26HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-03-31HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-03-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-28HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-02-28HouseRead first time
2017-02-01HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1424
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01424I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01424H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01424E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01424S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01424F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1424&RcdVtNo=502&Ch=H&Dt=04/27/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1424&RcdVtNo=527&Ch=H&Dt=04/28/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-23-F.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1424&RcdVtNo=2014&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=57

Bill Comments

feedback