TX HB1309 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the offense of possession or promotion of certain visual material depicting a minor and to certain educational programs concerning the prevention and awareness of that offense.
Title
Relating to the creation of the offense of possession or promotion of certain visual material depicting a minor and to certain educational programs concerning the prevention and awareness of that offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-20 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-05 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-05 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time | |
2011-02-14 | Filed |
Subjects
BULLYING
Crime Prevention
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
PORNOGRAPHY
Crime Prevention
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
PORNOGRAPHY