TX HB13 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 85-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-15 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 85-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-15 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to reporting requirements by certain physicians and health care facilities for abortion complications; authorizing a civil penalty.
Title
Relating to reporting requirements by certain physicians and health care facilities for abortion complications; authorizing a civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-11 - Senate - Reason for vote recorded in Journal (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#19 (Y: 94 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-07-27 - House - Record vote RV#15 (Y: 97 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-07-27 - House - Amendment tabled RV#14 (Y: 92 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-07-27 - House - RV#12 RV#13 (Y: 115 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-07-27 - House - Amendment tabled RV#12 (Y: 92 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-07-27 - House - RV#11 (Y: 105 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#19 (Y: 94 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-07-27 - House - Record vote RV#15 (Y: 97 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-07-27 - House - Amendment tabled RV#14 (Y: 92 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-07-27 - House - RV#12 RV#13 (Y: 115 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-07-27 - House - Amendment tabled RV#12 (Y: 92 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-07-27 - House - RV#11 (Y: 105 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-15 | Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . | |
2017-08-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-08-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-08-12 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-08-11 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-08-11 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Passed |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-08-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-08-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-08-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-07-31 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-07-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-07-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-07-28 | House | Passed |
2017-07-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-07-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-07-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-07-27 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-07-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-07-27 | House | Amendment tabled |
2017-07-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-07-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-07-27 | House | Amended |
2017-07-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-07-27 | House | Amendment tabled |
2017-07-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-07-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-07-27 | House | Amended |
2017-07-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-07-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-07-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-07-26 | House | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-07-26 | House | Corrected comm. report distributed |
2017-07-25 | House | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator |
2017-07-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-07-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-07-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-07-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-07-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-07-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-07-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-07-20 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-07-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-07-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Abortion
Electronic Information Systems
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
PHYSICIANS
Electronic Information Systems
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
PHYSICIANS