TX HB129 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to digital citizenship instruction in public schools.
Title
Relating to digital citizenship instruction in public schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] |
Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] | Sen. Cesar Blanco [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - Amended RV#337 (Y: 105 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - Amended RV#319 (Y: 113 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - Amended RV#319 (Y: 113 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-20 | House | Record vote RV#337 |
2021-04-20 | House | Passed as amended |
2021-04-20 | House | Amended 1-Slaton |
2021-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-19 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-19 | House | Record vote RV#319 |
2021-04-19 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-19 | House | Amended 1-Patterson, Leach, K. Bell, Buckley, and Capriglione |
2021-04-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Electronic Information Systems
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Electronic Information Systems