TX HB1287 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exclusion of certain resources in determining eligibility for the supplemental nutrition assistance program.
Title
Relating to the exclusion of certain resources in determining eligibility for the supplemental nutrition assistance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-26 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#2164 (Y: 108 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#244 (Y: 108 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - Read 2nd time RV#222 (Y: 117 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#244 (Y: 108 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - Read 2nd time RV#222 (Y: 117 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-26 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-26 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2023-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#2164 |
2023-05-26 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2023-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2023-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2023-05-25 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-18 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-18 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-18 | House | Record vote RV#244 |
2023-04-18 | House | Passed |
2023-04-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-17 | House | Record vote RV#222 |
2023-04-17 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-17 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-13 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2023-03-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB273 (Same As) 2023-03-08 - Co-author authorized
HB1099 (Same As) 2023-03-02 - Referred to Human Services
SB273 (Same As) 2023-03-08 - Co-author authorized
HB1099 (Same As) 2023-03-02 - Referred to Human Services
SB273 (Same As) 2023-03-08 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Food Programs
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Human Services
Human Services--Food Programs
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General