TX HB1244 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the United States history end-of-course assessment instrument administered to public high school students and reporting requirements for that assessment instrument.
Title
Relating to the United States history end-of-course assessment instrument administered to public high school students and reporting requirements for that assessment instrument.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1763 (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#63 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#63 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1763 |
2019-05-23 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-03-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-03-20 | House | Record vote RV#63 |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed |
2019-03-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-19 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-03-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-06 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education--School Districts
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education--School Districts