TX HB1228 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the phaseout and repeal of the miscellaneous gross receipts tax on utility companies; decreasing the rates of the tax.
Title
Relating to the phaseout and repeal of the miscellaneous gross receipts tax on utility companies; decreasing the rates of the tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Phil King [R] | Rep. Jim Murphy [R] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-01 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--General
Taxation--Occupation Tax
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Utilities--Natural Gas
Utilities--Water & Sewer
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--General
Taxation--Occupation Tax
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Utilities--Natural Gas
Utilities--Water & Sewer
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1228 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01228I.htm |