TX HB1156 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to creating the criminal offense of financial abuse of an elderly individual.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to creating the criminal offense of financial abuse of an elderly individual.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1068 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenatePassed
2021-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-17SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-05-14SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-05-14SenateRead first time
2021-05-14SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-13HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-13HouseRecord vote RV#1068
2021-05-13HousePassed
2021-05-13HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-12HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-12HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-10HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-29HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-29HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29HouseNo action taken in committee
2021-03-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-04HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-03-04HouseRead first time
2021-01-15HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1156
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01156I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01156H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01156E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01156S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01156F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01156I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01156H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01156H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01156E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01156E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1156&RcdVtNo=1068&Ch=H&Dt=05/13/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=18

Bill Comments 750

feedback