TX HB1119 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of the Texas Uninsured Vehicle Enforcement Program.
Title
Relating to the establishment of the Texas Uninsured Vehicle Enforcement Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2021-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2086 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Transportation
Subjects
Insurance
Insurance--Motor Vehicles
LICENSE PLATES
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Insurance/Financial Responsibility
Insurance--Motor Vehicles
LICENSE PLATES
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Insurance/Financial Responsibility