TX HB108 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of the skills development fund to facilitate the relocation to or expansion in this state of employers offering complex or high-skilled employment opportunities.
Title
Relating to the use of the skills development fund to facilitate the relocation to or expansion in this state of employers offering complex or high-skilled employment opportunities.
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Alvarado [D] | Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Diego Bernal [D] | Rep. Chris Paddie [R] |
Rep. Larry Gonzales [R] | Rep. Dennis Paul [R] | Sen. Larry Taylor [R] | Sen. Sylvia Garcia [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1160 (Y: 115 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1137 (Y: 116 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1160 (Y: 115 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1137 (Y: 116 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-11 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | House | Passed |
2017-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-10 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-10 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2017-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2016-11-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Junior College Districts
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
TECHNICAL EDUCATION
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Education--Junior College Districts
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
TECHNICAL EDUCATION
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS