TX HB1057 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to indicators of achievement under the public school accountability system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to indicators of achievement under the public school accountability system.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-21HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-21HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-21HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-21HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-02-21HouseRead first time
2017-01-17HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback