TX HB105 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of promotoras and community health workers in Medicaid managed care.
Title
Relating to the use of promotoras and community health workers in Medicaid managed care.
Sponsors
Rep. Lina Ortega [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1171 (Y: 107 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1171 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-13 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB136 (Same As) 2021-03-03 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
PROMOTORAS
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
PROMOTORAS