TX HB1048 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the number of counties or municipalities necessary to establish a regional drug court program.
Title
Relating to the number of counties or municipalities necessary to establish a regional drug court program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-26 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Corrections | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time | |
2009-02-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB633 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately