TX SB633 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately

Summary

Relating to the number of counties or municipalities necessary to establish a regional drug court program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the number of counties or municipalities necessary to establish a regional drug court program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-06-19 Effective immediately
2009-06-19 Signed by the Governor
2009-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2009-05-22 Signed in the House
2009-05-22 Signed in the Senate
2009-05-21 Reported enrolled
2009-05-21 House passage reported
2009-05-20 Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2009-05-20 Record vote
2009-05-20 Passed
2009-05-20 Read 3rd time
2009-05-19 Passed to 3rd reading
2009-05-19 Read 2nd time
2009-05-19 Placed on General State Calendar
2009-05-15 Considered in Calendars
2009-05-02 Considered in Calendars
2009-04-07 Committee report sent to Calendars
2009-04-06 Committee report printed and distributed
2009-04-06 Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2009-04-02 Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2009-04-02 Considered in public hearing
2009-03-31 Referred to Corrections
2009-03-31 Read first time
2009-03-19 Received from the Senate
2009-03-19 Reported engrossed
2009-03-19 Record vote
2009-03-19 Passed
2009-03-19 Read 3rd time
2009-03-19 Record vote
2009-03-19 Three day rule suspended
2009-03-19 Vote recorded in Journal
2009-03-19 Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2009-03-19 Laid before the Senate
2009-03-19 Placed on local & uncontested calendar
2009-03-16 Not again placed on intent calendar
2009-03-11 Placed on intent calendar
2009-03-09 Committee report printed and distributed
2009-03-09 Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
2009-03-09 Reported favorably w/o amendments
2009-03-04 Considered in public hearing
2009-03-04 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-02-23 Referred to Jurisprudence
2009-02-23 Read first time
2009-02-02 Filed
2009-02-02 Received by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1048 (Same As) 2009-03-26 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback