TX HB1013 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 76-12)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-17 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-17 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers and duties of the Texas Medical Board and the regulation of certain persons licensed by the board.
Title
Relating to the powers and duties of the Texas Medical Board and the regulation of certain persons licensed by the board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-17 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2011-05-17 | Read first time | |
2011-05-11 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-11 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-10 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-10 | Record vote | |
2011-05-10 | Passed | |
2011-05-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-09 | Record vote | |
2011-05-09 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-05-09 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-05-09 | Amended | |
2011-05-09 | Amended | |
2011-05-09 | Amended | |
2011-05-09 | Amended | |
2011-05-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-05 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-19 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-19 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-06 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-06 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-16 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-16 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Public Health | |
2011-02-28 | Read first time | |
2011-01-31 | Filed |
Subjects
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--General
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS
Health Care Providers
Health--General
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS