TN SR7001 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-24 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-24 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Whitehaven Baptist Church, 175th anniversary
Title
A RESOLUTION to recognize Whitehaven Baptist Church on the occasion of its 175th anniversary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-08-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-08-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-08-23 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 8/23/2023 |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-08-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-08-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |