TN SR0074 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Tom Haynes
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor Tom Haynes for his meritorious service to the Tennessee State Employees Association.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 3 for 4/29/2021 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |