TN SJR9014 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-19 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-19 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
South Greene High School girls' golf team, TSSAA Region 1-A Championship
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and congratulate the South Greene High School girls' golf team upon winning the TSSAA Region 1-A Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-11-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-10-29 | House | Concurred, Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-10-29 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. #2 for 10/29/21 |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 10/29/2021 |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |