TN SJR1768 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Lebanon High School boys' basketball team, TSSAA Division I, Class 4A Final Four
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and commend the members and coaches of the Lebanon High School boys' basketball team upon advancing to the Final Four of the TSSAA Division I, Class 4A state tournament.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-27 | House | Concurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-27 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. #2 for 4/27/22 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |