TN SJR0797 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Roy Apple
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor the memory of Roy Anderson Apple of Greenbrier.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-01-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-01-27 | House | Concurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2022-01-26 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 1/27/2022 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 1/26/2022 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |