TN SJR0530 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress and the United States Department of Health and Human Services to revise and update the Medicare Wage Index factor.
Title
Urges Congress and the United States Department of Health and Human Services to revise and update the Medicare Wage Index factor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |