TN SJR0462 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to Article II, Section 28, of the Constitution of Tennessee to prohibit the legislature from imposing a state property tax on real property.
Title
Proposes an amendment to Article II, Section 28, of the Constitution of Tennessee to prohibit the legislature from imposing a state property tax on real property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR0462&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SJR0462.pdf |