TN SJR0450 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Scott Wietecha, 2017 St. Jude Rock 'n' Roll Nashville Marathon
Title
Scott Wietecha, 2017 St. Jude Rock 'n' Roll Nashville Marathon
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-05-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-05-10 | House | Concurred, Ayes 82, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-05-09 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 5/10/17 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |