TN SJR0214 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-14 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-14 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Sean Monroe Hickey, Valedictorian, Westmoreland High School
Title
Sean Monroe Hickey, Valedictorian, Westmoreland High School
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Black [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-14 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-04-13 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2009-04-13 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-04-13 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-04-13 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2009-04-09 | Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, pnv 1 | |
2009-04-06 | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/9/09 | |
2009-04-06 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-04-06 | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (1) cal. for 04/06/2009 | |
2009-04-02 | P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-03-30 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-03-30 | Filed for intro. |