TN SJR0129 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the governor, department of human services, department of children's services, department of finance and administration, department of safety, courts, and nonprofit institutions within the State to take action to expand access to adoption in the State of Tennessee and allow more children to experience permanency in a safe and loving home on a faster time line.
Title
A RESOLUTION to urge the expansion of adoption services in Tennessee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/13/2023 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |